SB0517 (CH0217)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Washington County - Contributions to Nonprofit Organizations - Process

Sponsored by:

Washington County Senators

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/4/20162/4/2016First Reading Budget and Taxation
2/5/20162/5/2016Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
2/29/20162/29/2016Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
3/1/20163/1/2016Favorable Report Adopted34
Second Reading Passed34
3/3/20163/3/2016Third Reading Passed (47-0)36
House3/4/20163/4/2016First Reading Environment and Transportation38
4/5/20164/5/2016Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
4/7/20163/31/2016Favorable Report Adopted63
Second Reading Passed63
4/11/20164/6/2016Third Reading Passed (141-0)69
Senate4/11/20164/6/2016Returned Passed66
Post Passage4/26/20164/26/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:09 P.M.