SB0520 (CH0397)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

County Boards of Education - School Buses - Motor Fuel Tax Exemption and Refund

Sponsored by:

Washington County Senators

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/4/20162/4/2016First Reading Budget and Taxation
2/5/20162/5/2016Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
3/7/20163/7/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/8/20163/8/2016Favorable with Amendments {129338/1 Report Adopted39
Second Reading Passed with Amendments39
3/10/20163/10/2016Third Reading Passed (46-0)41
House3/11/20163/11/2016First Reading Ways and Means43
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
4/6/20164/6/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/6/20163/30/2016Favorable with Amendments {395367/1 Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62
4/7/20164/1/2016Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)64
Senate4/9/20164/3/2016Senate Concur - House Amendments63
Third Reading Passed (43-0)63
Passed Enrolled63
Post Passage5/10/20165/10/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:09 P.M.