SB0531

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Law - Access to Firearms - Penalties

Sponsored by:

Senator Ferguson

Status:

In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/31/20131/31/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2/6/20132/6/2013Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2/27/20132/27/2013Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
3/5/20133/5/2013Hearing cancelled
3/18/20133/18/2013Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:09 P.M.