SB0533

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Assessments - Administration and Provision of Information

Sponsored by:

Senator Pinsky

Status:

Veto sustained (0-46)


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/4/20162/4/2016First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/20162/10/2016Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
3/14/20163/14/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/20163/15/2016Favorable with Amendments {504438/1 Report Adopted44
Second Reading Passed with Amendments44
3/16/20163/16/2016Third Reading Passed (34-10)45
House3/17/20163/14/2016First Reading Ways and Means46
3/22/20163/22/2016Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
3/23/20163/23/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
3/24/20163/24/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
4/8/20164/8/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/8/20164/2/2016Favorable with Amendments {845367/1 Report Adopted65
Second Reading Passed with Amendments65
4/9/20164/4/2016Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0)67
Senate4/11/20164/5/2016Senate Concur - House Amendment65
Third Reading Passed (46-0)65
Passed Enrolled65
Post Passage5/27/20165/27/2016Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Senate1/18/20171/18/2017Veto sustained (0-46)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:09 P.M.