SB0539

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Firearms - Detachable Magazines - Maximum Capacity for Ammunition

Sponsored by:

Senator Raskin

Status:

In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/1/20132/1/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2/6/20132/6/2013Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2/27/20132/27/2013Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
3/1/20133/1/2013Hearing cancelled
3/11/20133/11/2013Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:09 P.M.