SB0544 (CH0401)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Motor Vehicle Insurance - Insurance Identification Card - Carrying Proof of Coverage - Uninsured Motorist Education and Enforcement Fund

Sponsored by:

Senator Middleton

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 401


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/4/20162/4/2016First Reading Finance
2/10/20162/10/2016Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
3/21/20163/21/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
3/21/20163/18/2016Favorable with Amendments {237377/1 Report Adopted47A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47A
3/21/20163/19/2016Third Reading Passed (44-0)48A
House3/22/20163/20/2016First Reading Economic Matters52
3/29/20163/29/2016Favorable Report by Economic Matters
3/29/20163/24/2016Favorable Report Adopted56
Second Reading Passed56
3/30/20163/25/2016Third Reading Passed (137-0)57
Senate3/31/20163/27/2016Returned Passed56
Post Passage5/10/20165/10/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 401

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:09 P.M.