SB0562 (CH0384)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Assessments - Administration by Public School Employees

Sponsored by:

Senator Zucker

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 384


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/31/20181/31/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/5/20183/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/20183/6/2018Favorable with Amendments {554733/1 Report Adopted40
Second Reading Passed with Amendments40
3/8/20183/8/2018Third Reading Passed (46-0)42
House3/9/20183/9/2018First Reading Ways and Means43
3/12/20183/12/2018Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20184/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/5/20183/27/2018Favorable with Amendments {125764/1 Report Adopted61A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61A
4/6/20183/29/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0)63
Senate4/9/20184/4/2018Senate Concur - House Amendments66
Third Reading Passed (46-0)66
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 384

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:33 P.M.