SB0563 (CH0500)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Environment and Public Utilities - Notice to Neighboring Jurisdictions of Applications

Sponsored by:

Senator Simonaire

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 500


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/1/20132/1/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/20132/6/2013Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
3/7/20133/7/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/20133/11/2013Favorable with Amendments {124933/1 Report Adopted42
Second Reading Passed with Amendments42
3/13/20133/13/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)44
House3/13/20133/13/2013First Reading Environmental Matters46
3/19/20133/19/2013Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
4/1/20134/1/2013Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
4/1/20133/26/2013Favorable Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed59
4/4/20133/29/2013Third Reading Passed (138-0)62
Senate4/4/20133/30/2013Returned Passed61A
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 500

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:09 P.M.