SB0570 (CH0312)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Visual Impairments – Requirements for Student Vision Screening and Information (Atticus Act)

Sponsored by:

Senator Bates

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 312


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/31/20181/31/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
4/2/20184/2/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/20183/28/2018Favorable with Amendments {364935/1 Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed with Amendments59
4/3/20183/29/2018Third Reading Passed (45-0)60
House4/3/20183/25/2018First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations59
4/4/20184/5/2018Rereferred to Ways and Means
4/5/20184/5/2018Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20184/7/2018Favorable Report by Ways and Means
4/7/20183/30/2018Favorable Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed64
4/9/20184/1/2018Third Reading Passed (136-0)66
Senate4/9/20184/3/2018Returned Passed65
Post Passage4/24/20184/24/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 312

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 24, 2018 2:57 P.M.