SB0584 (CH0683)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Preschool Development Grants - Expansion Grants - Required State Funding

Sponsored by:

Senator King

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 683


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/4/20162/4/2016First Reading Budget and Taxation
2/5/20162/5/2016Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2/17/20162/17/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/02 at 3:00 p.m.
3/22/20163/22/2016Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
3/22/20163/20/2016Favorable Report Adopted49
Second Reading Passed49
3/23/20163/21/2016Third Reading Passed (32-14)50
House3/24/20163/22/2016First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations54
4/4/20164/4/2016Rereferred to Appropriations
4/7/20164/7/2016Favorable Report by Appropriations
4/7/20163/31/2016Favorable Report Adopted63
Second Reading Passed63
4/7/20164/1/2016Third Reading Passed (90-43)64
Senate4/8/20164/2/2016Returned Passed62
Post Passage5/28/20165/28/2016Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 683

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:09 P.M.