SB0592 (CH0296)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Natural Resources - Shark Fins - Restriction on Possession or Distribution

Sponsored by:

Senator Frosh

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 296


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/1/20132/1/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/20132/6/2013Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
4/1/20134/1/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/20133/27/2013Favorable with Amendments {984534/158
Special Order until 4/2 (Senator Colburn) Adopted 58
4/2/20133/28/2013Favorable with Amendments {984534/159
Committee Amendment Adopted59
Special Order until 4/3 (Senator Mathias) Adopted (23-21) 59
4/3/20133/29/2013Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted60
Floor Amendment (Senator Colburn) {283123/1 Rejected (14-32)60
Second Reading Passed with Amendments60
4/4/20133/30/2013Third Reading Passed (41-6)61
House4/4/20133/29/2013First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations62
4/5/20134/5/2013Rereferred to Environmental Matters
4/6/20134/6/2013Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
4/6/20134/1/2013Favorable Report Adopted65
Second Reading Passed65
4/8/20134/3/2013Third Reading Passed (124-14)67
Senate4/8/20134/5/2013Returned Passed67
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 296

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:09 P.M.