SB0595 (CH0311)

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Charter School Improvement Act of 2015

Sponsored by:

President

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/6/20152/6/2015First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
2/9/20152/6/2015Motion Rules Suspended Rule 32 (Senator Pugh) Adopted18A
2/11/20152/11/2015Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
4/2/20154/2/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/20153/28/2015Favorable with Amendments {794139/155
Laid Over (Senator Kelley) Adopted55
4/3/20153/29/2015Favorable with Amendments {794139/1 Report Adopted56
Second Reading Passed with Amendments56
4/6/20153/30/2015Third Reading Passed (46-1)57
House4/7/20154/1/2015First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations62
4/8/20154/8/2015Rereferred to Ways and Means
Hearing 4/09 at 1:00 p.m.
4/10/20154/10/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/10/20154/5/2015Favorable with Amendments {535864/1 Report Adopted66
Special Order until 4/11 (Delegate Hixson) Adopted 66
4/11/20154/6/2015Second Reading Passed with Amendments67
4/13/20154/11/2015Third Reading Passed with Amendments (131-7)72
Senate4/13/20154/10/2015Senate Concur - House Amendments68
Third Reading Passed (44-1)68
Passed Enrolled68
Post Passage5/12/20155/12/2015Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:49 P.M.