SB0610

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Task Force on the Forest Conservation Act Offset Policy

Sponsored by:

Senator Young

Status:

In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (103-36)


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/31/20181/31/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
3/15/20183/15/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/20183/16/2018Favorable with Amendments {994034/148
Special Order until 3/19 (Senator Young) Adopted 48
3/19/20183/16/2018Favorable with Amendments {994034/148B
Special Order until 3/26 (Senator Young) Adopted 48b
3/26/20183/22/2018Favorable with Amendments {994034/153
Committee Amendment Withdrawn53
Favorable Report Adopted53
Floor Amendment {903729/1 (Senator Young)53
Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted53
3/27/20183/23/2018Floor Amendment {903729/1 (Senator Young)54
Motion Special Order until 3/28 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (18-29)54
Floor Amendment {903729/1 (Senator Young) Adopted54
Floor Amendment {183425/1 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted54
Special Order until later today (Senator Bates) Adopted 54
Floor Amendment {823624/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected54
Second Reading Passed with Amendments54
3/28/20183/24/2018Third Reading Passed (36-10)55
House3/29/20183/22/2018First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations56
4/4/20184/5/2018Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
4/9/20184/9/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
4/9/20184/1/2018Favorable with Amendments {840312/1 Report Adopted66
Second Reading Passed with Amendments66
4/9/20184/2/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (103-36)67

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 9, 2018 5:15 P.M.