SB0620

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Family Law - Denial of Paternity, Custody, and Visitation

Sponsored by:

Senator Raskin

Status:

In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/1/20132/1/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2/6/20132/6/2013Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/12/20133/12/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/13/20133/13/2013Favorable Report Adopted44
Second Reading Passed44
3/15/20133/15/2013Third Reading Passed (41-0)46
House3/18/20133/15/2013First Reading Judiciary48A
3/19/20133/19/2013Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:09 P.M.