SB0624 (CH0300)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Identity Fraud - Health Information and Health Care Records

Sponsored by:

Senator Pugh

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 300


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/1/20132/1/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2/6/20132/6/2013Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
3/18/20133/18/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/19/20133/17/2013Favorable with Amendments {668472/1 Report Adopted48
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48
3/21/20133/19/2013Third Reading Passed (46-0)50
House3/21/20133/18/2013First Reading Judiciary51
3/23/20133/23/2013Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20134/3/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
4/3/20133/28/2013Favorable with Amendments {522819/1 Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61
4/4/20133/30/2013Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)63
Senate4/5/20134/1/2013Senate Concur - House Amendment63
Third Reading Passed (44-0)63
Passed Enrolled63
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 300

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:09 P.M.