SB0627

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Maintenance of Effort Requirement - Alteration and Study

Sponsored by:

Senator Eckardt

Status:

In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/6/20152/6/2015First Reading Budget and Taxation
2/18/20152/18/2015Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
4/2/20154/2/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
4/3/20153/29/2015Favorable with Amendments {429632/1 Report Adopted56
Second Reading Passed with Amendments56
4/6/20153/30/2015Third Reading Passed (47-0)57
House4/7/20154/1/2015First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations62

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:49 P.M.