SB0639 (CH0013)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Public School Personnel - Disciplinary Hearing Procedures

Sponsored by:

Senator Guzzone

Status:

Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 13


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/1/20182/1/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/20182/7/2018Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/14/20183/14/2018Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/20183/15/2018Favorable Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed47
3/19/20183/17/2018Third Reading Passed (34-13)48C
House3/20/20183/16/2018First Reading Ways and Means50
3/20/20183/20/2018Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
3/22/20183/22/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
3/28/20183/28/2018Hearing canceled
3/29/20183/29/2018Favorable Report by Ways and Means
3/29/20183/22/2018Favorable Report Adopted56
Second Reading Passed56
3/30/20183/23/2018Third Reading Passed (88-48)57
Senate4/5/20183/24/2018Returned Passed58
Post Passage4/4/20184/4/2018Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Senate4/5/20183/31/2018Veto overridden (32-14)62
House4/5/20183/27/2018Veto overridden (89-49)61
Post Passage4/5/20184/5/2018Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 13

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 5, 2018 5:53 P.M.