SB0641 (CH0067)

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Kathleen A. Mathias Oral Chemotherapy Improvement Act of 2014

Sponsored by:

Senator Mathias

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 67


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/30/20141/30/2014First Reading Finance
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2/28/20142/28/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
3/3/20143/3/2014Favorable with Amendments {187677/1 Report Adopted37
Second Reading Passed with Amendments37
3/5/20143/5/2014Third Reading Passed (46-0)39
House3/5/20143/5/2014First Reading Health and Government Operations41
3/10/20143/10/2014Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
3/14/20143/14/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/14/20143/11/2014Favorable with Amendments {296786/1 Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/17/20143/13/2014Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)49
Senate3/17/20143/12/2014Senate Concur - House Amendments46
Third Reading Passed (46-0)46
Passed Enrolled46
Post Passage4/8/20144/8/2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 67

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:56 P.M.