SB0644 (CH0069)

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

State Government - Open Data Policy - Council on Open Data

Sponsored by:

Senator Ferguson

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 69


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/30/20141/30/2014First Reading Senate Rules
2/5/20142/5/2014Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs19
2/6/20142/6/2014Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
3/14/20143/14/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/20143/11/2014Favorable with Amendments {554839/1 Report Adopted45
Second Reading Passed with Amendments45
3/17/20143/12/2014Third Reading Passed (47-0)46
House3/18/20143/15/2014First Reading Health and Government Operations51
3/19/20143/19/2014Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
3/31/20143/31/2014Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
4/1/20143/25/2014Favorable Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed61
4/2/20143/26/2014Third Reading Passed (132-0)62
Senate4/3/20143/25/2014Returned Passed59
Post Passage4/8/20144/8/2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 69

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 8, 2014 12:16 P.M.