SB0708

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Tobacco-Related Disease Products Research, Development, and Commercialization Program

Sponsored by:

Senator Madaleno

Status:

In the House - First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/1/20132/1/2013First Reading Finance
2/5/20132/5/2013Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
3/20/20133/20/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
3/21/20133/19/2013Favorable with Amendments {207274/1 Report Adopted50
Second Reading Passed with Amendments50
3/25/20133/21/2013Third Reading Passed (37-7)52
House3/26/20133/22/2013First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations55A

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:09 P.M.