SB0710 (CH0727)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Children With Disabilities - Individualized Education Program Process - Parental Consent

Sponsored by:

Senator Conway

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 727


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/3/20172/3/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/8/20172/8/2017Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
3/27/20173/27/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/20173/23/2017Favorable with Amendments {974137/1 Report Adopted52
Second Reading Passed with Amendments52
3/28/20173/24/2017Third Reading Passed (47-0)53
House3/28/20173/23/2017First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations57
4/4/20174/5/2017Rereferred to Ways and Means
4/4/20174/4/2017Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
4/6/20174/6/2017Favorable Report by Ways and Means
4/6/20173/30/2017Favorable Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed64
4/8/20174/1/2017Third Reading Passed (138-0)66
Senate4/10/20174/2/2017Returned Passed62
Post Passage5/25/20175/25/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 727

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:12 P.M.