SB0715 (CH0309)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Maryland Highway Safety Act of 2013

Sponsored by:

Senator Ramirez

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 309


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/1/20132/1/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2/6/20132/6/2013Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
3/18/20133/18/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/19/20133/17/2013Favorable with Amendments {398479/148
Laid Over (Senator Frosh) Adopted48
3/20/20133/18/2013Favorable with Amendments {398479/149
Special Order until 3/21 (Senator Pipkin) Adopted 49
3/22/20133/20/2013Favorable with Amendments {398479/1 Report Adopted51
Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) {353124/1 Rejected (18-29)51
Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) {443624/3 Adopted (24-22)51
Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) {783625/1 Withdrawn51
Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) {963824/1 Rejected (17-28)51
Second Reading Passed with Amendments51
3/25/20133/21/2013Third Reading Passed (29-18)52
House3/26/20133/22/2013First Reading Judiciary55A
3/26/20133/26/2013Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable Report by Judiciary
4/4/20133/29/2013Favorable Report Adopted62
Special Order until next session (Delegate Vallario) Adopted 62
4/4/20133/30/2013Floor Amendment (Delegate George) {943628/163
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Rejected63
Floor Amendment (Delegate George) Rejected (56-80)63
Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {233129/1 Rejected (50-78)63
Floor Amendment (Delegate Impallaria) {503929/1 Rejected (48-85)63
Floor Amendment (Delegate Parrott) {763927/1 Rejected (45-84)63
Floor Amendment (Delegate McMillan) {703424/1 Rejected (50-79)63
Floor Amendment (Delegate Krebs) {923427/1 Rejected (48-84)63
Floor Amendment (Delegate McDonough) {923720/1 Rejected (50-81)63
Floor Amendment (Delegate George) {713623/1 Rejected (44-89)63
Floor Amendment (Delegate Impallaria) {923422/1 Rejected (47-84)63
Floor Amendment (Delegate Parrott) {383429/1 Rejected (50-82)63
Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {983321/1 Rejected (43-86)63
Second Reading Passed63
4/5/20133/31/2013Third Reading Passed (82-55)64
Senate4/5/20134/1/2013Returned Passed63
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 309

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 18, 2013 4:07 P.M.