SB0721

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Police Training Commission - Membership - Police Chiefs' Association of Prince George's County

Sponsored by:

Senator Ramirez

Status:

In the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/1/20132/1/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2/6/20132/6/2013Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
3/28/20133/28/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/28/20133/24/2013Favorable Report Adopted55
Second Reading Passed55
3/29/20133/25/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)56
House4/1/20133/26/2013First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations59
4/2/20134/2/2013Rereferred to Judiciary
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:09 P.M.