SB0725 (CH0366)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Bullying, Cyberbullying, Harassment, and Intimidation – School Response

Sponsored by:

Senator Zirkin

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 366


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/2/20182/2/2018First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2/5/20182/5/2018Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs19
2/7/20182/7/2018Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
3/5/20183/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/6/20183/6/2018Favorable with Amendments {428777/1 Report Adopted40
Second Reading Passed with Amendments40
3/8/20183/8/2018Third Reading Passed (46-0)42
House3/9/20183/9/2018First Reading Judiciary43
3/14/20183/14/2018Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
4/9/20184/9/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
4/9/20184/4/2018Favorable with Amendments {992116/1 Report Adopted69
Second Reading Passed with Amendments69
Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Dumais) Adopted (130-6)69
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-4)69
Senate4/9/20184/5/2018Senate Concur - House Amendments67
Third Reading Passed (46-0)67
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 366

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:33 P.M.