SB0735 (CH0426)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission - Authority to Borrow Money

Sponsored by:

Senator Waugh

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 426


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/3/20172/3/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/8/20172/8/2017Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/7/20173/7/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/20173/8/2017Favorable with Amendments {684330/1 Report Adopted39
Second Reading Passed with Amendments39
3/10/20173/10/2017Third Reading Passed (46-0)41
House3/10/20173/10/2017First Reading Environment and Transportation43
3/28/20173/28/2017Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20174/7/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
4/7/20173/31/2017Favorable with Amendments {790715/1 Report Adopted65
Second Reading Passed with Amendments65
4/10/20174/2/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (141-0)67
Senate4/10/20174/3/2017Senate Concur - House Amendments63A
Third Reading Passed (46-0)63A
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/4/20175/4/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 426

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2017 9:12 A.M.