SB0736

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

St. Mary's County - Public Facility Bonds

Sponsored by:

Senator Waugh

Status:

Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/3/20172/3/2017First Reading Budget and Taxation
2/8/20172/8/2017Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
3/2/20173/2/2017Hearing canceled
3/15/20173/15/2017Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/23/20173/23/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/23/20173/21/2017Favorable with Amendments {779334/1 Report Adopted50
Second Reading Passed with Amendments50
3/24/20173/22/2017Third Reading Passed (47-0)51
House3/24/20173/21/2017First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations55
4/4/20174/5/2017Rereferred to Appropriations
4/4/20174/4/2017Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20174/7/2017Favorable Report by Appropriations
4/10/20174/3/2017Favorable Report Adopted68
Second Reading Passed68
4/10/20174/4/2017Third Reading Passed (137-0)69
Senate4/10/20174/4/2017Returned Passed64
Post Passage5/26/20175/26/2017Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 30, 2017 1:01 P.M.