SB0737 (CH0424)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

St. Mary's County - Bonds and Other Evidences of Indebtedness - Limitations and Repayment

Sponsored by:

Senator Waugh

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 424


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/3/20172/3/2017First Reading Budget and Taxation
2/8/20172/8/2017Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2/20/20172/20/2017Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
3/13/20173/13/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/14/20173/14/2017Favorable with Amendments {219231/1 Report Adopted43
Second Reading Passed with Amendments43
3/16/20173/16/2017Special Order until 3/17 (Senator Waugh) Adopted 45
3/17/20173/17/2017Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Waugh) Adopted46
Floor Amendment {813225/1 (Senator Waugh) Adopted46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/20/20173/18/2017Third Reading Passed (47-0)47
House3/21/20173/18/2017First Reading Appropriations52
3/22/20173/22/2017Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20174/7/2017Favorable Report by Appropriations
4/10/20174/3/2017Favorable Report Adopted68
Second Reading Passed68
4/10/20174/4/2017Third Reading Passed (137-0)69
Senate4/10/20174/4/2017Returned Passed64
Post Passage5/4/20175/4/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 424

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2017 9:12 A.M.