SB0739

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

State Board of Education - Membership - Teachers and Parent

Sponsored by:

Senator Madaleno

Status:

Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/5/20182/5/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/2/20182/2/2018Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/22/20183/22/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/20183/20/2018Favorable with Amendments {564630/1 Report Adopted51
Second Reading Passed with Amendments51
3/23/20183/21/2018Third Reading Passed (37-10)52
House3/26/20183/19/2018First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations53
3/28/20183/28/2018Rereferred to Ways and Means
3/29/20183/29/2018Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20184/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/5/20183/27/2018Favorable with Amendments {915864/1 Report Adopted61A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61A
4/6/20183/28/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (91-46)62
Senate4/9/20184/2/2018Senate Concur - House Amendments64
Third Reading Passed (33-12)64
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/25/20185/25/2018Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 29, 2018 3:54 P.M.