SB0740

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

State Department of Education – Breakfast and Lunch Programs – Funding (Maryland Cares for Kids Act)

Sponsored by:

Senator Madaleno

Status:

Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/5/20182/5/2018First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/20182/7/2018Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
3/19/20183/19/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/19/20183/16/2018Favorable with Amendments {809437/1 Report Adopted48B
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48B
3/19/20183/17/2018Third Reading Passed (47-0)48C
House3/20/20183/16/2018First Reading Ways and Means50
3/20/20183/20/2018Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
3/22/20183/22/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
4/2/20184/2/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/2/20183/24/2018Favorable with Amendments {175167/1 Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed with Amendments58
4/3/20183/25/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (114-21)59
Senate4/4/20183/30/2018Senate Concur - House Amendments61
Third Reading Passed (46-0)61
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/25/20185/25/2018Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 29, 2018 3:55 P.M.