SB0752 (CH0316)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Department of Budget and Management - Foster Youth Summer Internship Pilot Program

Sponsored by:

Senator Robey

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 316


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/1/20132/1/2013First Reading Finance
2/20/20132/20/2013Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
3/18/20133/18/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
3/19/20133/17/2013Favorable with Amendments {497479/1 Report Adopted48
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48
3/21/20133/19/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)50
House3/21/20133/18/2013First Reading Appropriations51
3/25/20133/25/2013Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20134/3/2013Favorable Report by Appropriations
4/3/20133/28/2013Favorable Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed61
4/4/20133/30/2013Third Reading Passed (137-0)63
Senate4/5/20133/31/2013Returned Passed62
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 316

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:10 P.M.