SB0756

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Primary and Secondary Education - Breakfast Program - School Requirements (Breakfast After the Bell Act)

Sponsored by:

Senator Madaleno

Status:

In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/5/20162/5/2016First Reading Budget and Taxation
2/10/20162/10/2016Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.
3/21/20163/21/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/21/20163/18/2016Favorable with Amendments {319439/1 Report Adopted47A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47A
3/21/20163/19/2016Third Reading Passed (43-0)48A
House3/22/20163/20/2016First Reading Ways and Means52
3/22/20163/22/2016Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
3/23/20163/23/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
3/24/20163/24/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
4/11/20164/11/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:10 P.M.