SB0760

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Grounds for Discipline

Sponsored by:

Senator Guzzone

Status:

In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/3/20172/3/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/8/20172/8/2017Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
3/20/20173/20/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/20173/17/2017Favorable with Amendments {864532/146A
Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted46A
3/21/20173/19/2017Favorable with Amendments {864532/1 Report Adopted (32-14)48
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48
3/22/20173/20/2017Third Reading Passed (32-15)49
House3/23/20173/20/2017First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations54

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:12 P.M.