SB0770 (CH0230)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Public High Schools - Agriculture Science

Sponsored by:

Senator Bates

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 230


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/5/20162/5/2016First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/20162/10/2016Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
2/29/20162/29/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/20163/1/2016Favorable with Amendments {404135/1 Report Adopted34
Second Reading Passed with Amendments34
3/3/20163/3/2016Third Reading Passed (47-0)36
House3/4/20163/4/2016First Reading Ways and Means38
3/11/20163/11/2016Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
4/8/20164/8/2016Favorable Report by Ways and Means
4/9/20164/3/2016Favorable Report Adopted66A
Second Reading Passed66A
4/9/20164/4/2016Third Reading Passed (135-1)67
Senate4/11/20164/3/2016Returned Passed63A
Post Passage4/26/20164/26/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 230

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:10 P.M.