SB0788

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Information Act - Revisions

Sponsored by:

Senator Kagan

Status:

In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/5/20182/5/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
3/14/20183/14/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/20183/15/2018Favorable with Amendments {424933/147
Laid Over (Senator Zirkin) Adopted47
3/16/20183/16/2018Favorable with Amendments {424933/148
Special Order until later today (Senator Smith) Adopted 48
Favorable with Amendments {424933/1 Report Adopted48A
Floor Amendment {873425/2 (Senator Hough) Adopted48A
Floor Amendment {873425/3 (Senator Hough) Adopted (37-6)48A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48A
3/19/20183/17/2018Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Smith) Adopted 48C
3/20/20183/18/2018Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)49

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 20, 2018 10:49 A.M.