SB0790

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

General Provisions – Historical State Song

Sponsored by:

Senator Kagan

Status:

In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/5/20182/5/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
3/12/20183/12/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/20183/13/2018Favorable with Amendments {814535/145
Special Order until 3/14 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 45
3/14/20183/14/2018Favorable with Amendments {814535/146
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted (25-19)46
Floor Amendment {853123/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (21-25)46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/16/20183/16/2018Third Reading Passed (30-13)48
House3/16/20183/13/2018First Reading Health and Government Operations47
3/21/20183/21/2018Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
4/9/20184/9/2018Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 9, 2018 4:03 P.M.