SB0803 (CH0195)

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Communications Between Patient or Client and Health Care Professional - Exceptions to Privilege

Sponsored by:

Senator Raskin

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 195


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/31/20141/31/2014First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2/5/20142/5/2014Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
3/10/20143/10/2014Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/11/20143/8/2014Favorable Report Adopted42
Second Reading Passed42
3/13/20143/10/2014Third Reading Passed (47-0)44
House3/13/20143/10/2014First Reading Judiciary46
3/17/20143/17/2014Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20144/3/2014Favorable Report by Judiciary
4/3/20143/27/2014Favorable Report Adopted63
Second Reading Passed63
4/4/20143/28/2014Third Reading Passed (134-0)64
Senate4/5/20143/27/2014Returned Passed61
Post Passage4/14/20144/14/2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 195

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:57 P.M.