SB0811 (CH0554)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Procurement - Investment Activities in Iran - Board of Public Works Authority to Adopt Regulations

Sponsored by:

Senator Rosapepe

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 554


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/1/20132/1/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/20132/13/2013Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
3/14/20133/14/2013Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/20133/15/2013Favorable Report Adopted46
Second Reading Passed46
3/19/20133/17/2013Third Reading Passed (46-0)48
House3/19/20133/16/2013First Reading Health and Government Operations49
3/27/20133/27/2013Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
4/5/20133/31/2013Favorable Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed64
4/6/20134/1/2013Third Reading Passed (131-1)65
Senate4/8/20134/2/2013Returned Passed64
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 554

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:10 P.M.