SB0820 (CH0561)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Animal Welfare - Spay/Neuter Fund - Establishment

Sponsored by:

Senator Benson

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 561


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/1/20132/1/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/20132/13/2013Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
3/18/20133/18/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/20133/17/2013Favorable with Amendments {844730/1 Report Adopted48
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48
3/21/20133/19/2013Third Reading Passed (46-1)50
House3/21/20133/18/2013First Reading Environmental Matters51
3/25/20133/25/2013Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
4/1/20134/1/2013Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
4/1/20133/26/2013Favorable Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed59
4/4/20133/29/2013Third Reading Passed (113-25)62
Senate4/4/20133/30/2013Returned Passed61A
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 561

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:10 P.M.