SB0826

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Open Meetings Act - Violations and Penalties

Sponsored by:

Senator Kittleman

Status:

In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/1/20132/1/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/20132/13/2013Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
3/18/20133/18/2013Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/20133/30/2013Favorable with Amendments {814438/1 Report Adopted61A
Special Order until later today (Senator Pipkin) Adopted 61A
4/5/20134/1/2013Second Reading Passed with Amendments63
4/8/20134/2/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)64
House4/8/20134/2/2013First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations66

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:10 P.M.