SB0855

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Carroll County - Public Schools - Collection of Biometric Information from Students - Prohibited

Sponsored by:

Senator Getty

Status:

In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/7/20132/7/2013First Reading Senate Rules
2/13/20132/13/2013Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/20132/20/2013Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
3/18/20133/18/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/20133/17/2013Favorable with Amendments {294932/1 Report Adopted48
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48
3/21/20133/19/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)50
House3/21/20133/18/2013First Reading Ways and Means51
3/21/20133/21/2013Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
4/6/20134/6/2013Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 18, 2013 4:07 P.M.