SB0877 (CH0350)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Promoting ext-Raordinary Innovation in Maryland's Economy (PRIME Act)

Sponsored by:

President

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 350


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/5/20182/5/2018First Reading Senate Rules
2/12/20182/12/2018Rereferred to Budget and Taxation and Finance
2/14/20182/14/2018Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
3/16/20183/16/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Favorable with Amendments {839230/1 Report Adopted48A
Floor Amendment {263626/2 (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted48A
Floor Amendment {663425/1 (Senator Rosapepe) Rejected (8-35)48A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48A
3/19/20183/17/2018Third Reading Passed (34-12)48C
House3/20/20183/16/2018First Reading Ways and Means50
3/22/20183/22/2018Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/29/20183/29/2018Favorable Report by Ways and Means
3/29/20183/22/2018Favorable Report Adopted56
Special Order until 3/30 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted 56
4/3/20183/25/2018Second Reading Passed59
4/4/20183/26/2018Motion vote previous question (Delegate Ebersole) Adopted60
Third Reading Passed (78-60)60
Senate4/5/20183/31/2018Returned Passed62
Post Passage4/25/20184/25/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 350

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 25, 2018 4:51 P.M.