SB0905 (CH0701)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education

Sponsored by:

Senator King

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 701


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/5/20162/5/2016First Reading Budget and Taxation
2/10/20162/10/2016Hearing 3/17 at 3:00 p.m.
2/17/20162/17/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/03 at 8:30 a.m.
2/19/20162/19/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/01 at 8:30 a.m.
3/7/20163/7/2016Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
3/8/20163/8/2016Favorable Report Adopted39
Second Reading Passed39
3/10/20163/10/2016Third Reading Passed (46-0)41
House3/11/20163/11/2016First Reading Ways and Means43
3/22/20163/22/2016Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
3/23/20163/23/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
3/24/20163/24/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
4/4/20164/4/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/4/20163/28/2016Favorable with Amendments {535362/1 Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed with Amendments60
4/5/20163/29/2016Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)61
Senate4/6/20163/31/2016Senate Concur - House Amendments60
Third Reading Passed (46-0)60
Passed Enrolled60
Post Passage5/28/20165/28/2016Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 701

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:10 P.M.