SB0910

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Maryland Education Development Collaborative - Established

Sponsored by:

Senator Ferguson

Status:

Veto sustained (0-45)


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/5/20162/5/2016First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/20162/10/2016Hearing 3/17 at 3:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
3/11/20163/11/2016Hearing cancelled (Budget and Taxation)
Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
3/22/20163/22/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/22/20163/20/2016Favorable with Amendments {179931/1 Report Adopted49
Second Reading Passed with Amendments49
3/23/20163/21/2016Third Reading Passed (46-0)50
House3/24/20163/22/2016First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations54
4/4/20164/4/2016Rereferred to Ways and Means
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
4/9/20164/9/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/11/20164/5/2016Favorable with Amendments {445062/1 Report Adopted68
Second Reading Passed with Amendments68
4/11/20164/6/2016Floor Amendment (Delegate Kaiser) {143322/1 Adopted69
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)69
Senate4/11/20164/6/2016Senate Concur - House Amendments66
Third Reading Passed (46-0)66
Passed Enrolled66
Post Passage5/27/20165/27/2016Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Senate2/2/20172/2/2017Veto sustained (0-45)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:10 P.M.