SB0949 (CH0801)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Possession of Marijuana

Sponsored by:

Senator Smith

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 801


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/3/20172/3/2017First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2/8/20172/8/2017Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
3/9/20173/9/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/13/20173/13/2017Favorable with Amendments {208977/1 Report Adopted42
Second Reading Passed with Amendments42
3/15/20173/15/2017Third Reading Passed (47-0)44
House3/15/20173/12/2017First Reading Judiciary46
3/16/20173/16/2017Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
3/31/20173/31/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/31/20173/27/2017Favorable with Amendments {632419/1 Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61
4/4/20173/28/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (94-43)62
Senate4/5/20173/30/2017Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments59
Senate Requests House Recede59
House4/7/20173/31/2017House Refuses to Recede65
Conference Committee Appointed65
Delegates Atterbeary, J. Lewis, and Rey65
Senate4/10/20174/2/2017Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments62
Conference Committee Appointed62
Senators Smith, Muse, and Ready62
House4/10/20174/4/2017Conference Committee Report Adopted69
Third Reading Passed (91-48)69
Senate4/10/20174/3/2017Conference Committee Report Adopted63A
Third Reading Passed (46-0)63A
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/27/20175/27/2017Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 801

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:13 P.M.