SB0950

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Students With Disabilities - Study of Parental Consent in the Individualized Education Program Process

Sponsored by:

Senator Conway

Status:

In the Senate - Third Reading Passed (45-0)


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/5/20162/5/2016First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/20162/10/2016Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
3/18/20163/18/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Favorable with Amendments {224338/1 Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/21/20163/19/2016Third Reading Passed (45-0)48
House3/21/20163/19/2016First Reading Ways and Means51
3/22/20163/22/2016Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
3/23/20163/23/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
3/24/20163/24/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
4/8/20164/8/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/8/20164/2/2016Favorable with Amendments {235163/1 Report Adopted65
Second Reading Passed with Amendments65
4/9/20164/4/2016Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0)67
Senate4/11/20164/5/2016Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments65
Senate Requests House Recede65
Conference Committee Appointed65
Senators Kagan, Bates, and Conway65
House4/11/20164/7/2016House Refuses to Recede70
Conference Committee Appointed70
Delegates M. Washington, Hornberger, and Ebersole70
Senate4/11/20164/7/2016Conference Committee Report Adopted67
Third Reading Passed (45-0)67

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:11 P.M.