SB0967

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Heroin and Opioid Prevention Effort (HOPE) and Treatment Act of 2017

Sponsored by:

Senator Klausmeier

Status:

In the Senate - Passed Enrolled


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/3/20172/3/2017First Reading Finance
2/10/20172/10/2017Reassigned to Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs21A
2/7/20172/7/2017Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
3/27/20173/27/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
3/27/20173/23/2017Favorable with Amendments {317377/1 Report Adopted52
Second Reading Passed with Amendments52
3/28/20173/24/2017Third Reading Passed (47-0)53
House3/28/20173/23/2017First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations57
4/4/20174/5/2017Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
4/5/20174/5/2017Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20174/7/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
4/7/20173/31/2017Favorable with Amendments {316883/1 Report Adopted65
Second Reading Passed with Amendments65
4/8/20174/1/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-1)66
Senate4/10/20174/3/2017Senate Concur - House Amendments63A
Third Reading Passed (46-0)63A
Passed Enrolled63A

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 10, 2017 8:48 P.M.