SB1001

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - County Boards of Education Payments

Sponsored by:

Senator Guzzone

Status:

In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-2)


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/3/20172/3/2017First Reading Budget and Taxation
2/8/20172/8/2017Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2/13/20172/13/2017Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
3/13/20173/13/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/14/20173/14/2017Favorable with Amendments {499337/1 Report Adopted43
Second Reading Passed with Amendments43
3/16/20173/16/2017Third Reading Passed (32-14)45
House3/16/20173/13/2017First Reading Appropriations47
3/22/20173/22/2017Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/23/20173/23/2017Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
3/24/20173/24/2017Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/24 at 10:00 a.m.
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/24/20173/21/2017Favorable with Amendments {634860/1 Report Adopted55
Second Reading Passed with Amendments55
Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (119-14)55
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-2)55

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:13 P.M.