SB1017

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Chief Executive Officer or County Executive - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office

Sponsored by:

Senator Raskin

Status:

In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/13/20142/13/2014First Reading Senate Rules
2/26/20142/27/2014Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/20142/27/2014Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
3/26/20143/26/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/20143/19/2014Favorable with Amendments {434637/1 Report Adopted53
Second Reading Passed with Amendments53
3/27/20143/20/2014Third Reading Passed (47-0)54
House3/27/20143/22/2014First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations58

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:57 P.M.