SB1028

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Health Occupations - Conversion Therapy for Minors - Prohibition (Youth Mental Health Protection Act)

Sponsored by:

Senator Madaleno

Status:

In the Senate - Returned Passed


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/5/20182/5/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/20182/7/2018Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
3/22/20183/22/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/20183/20/2018Favorable with Amendments {664932/151
Special Order until 3/26 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 51
3/26/20183/22/2018Favorable with Amendments {664932/153
Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted53
3/27/20183/23/2018Committee Amendment Adopted54
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted (32-14)54
Floor Amendment {893529/2 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (13-33)54
Floor Amendment {453624/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected54
Floor Amendment {263124/1 (Senator Salling) Rejected54
Second Reading Passed with Amendments54
3/28/20183/24/2018Third Reading Passed (34-12)55
House3/29/20183/22/2018First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations56
3/30/20184/2/2018Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
4/3/20184/3/2018Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
4/3/20183/25/2018Favorable Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed59
4/4/20183/26/2018Floor Amendment {353422/1 (Delegate Parrott) Rejected (39-81)60
Floor Amendment {133826/2 (Delegate Parrott) Rejected (37-88)60
Floor Amendment {353825/1 (Delegate Parrott) Rejected (36-86)60
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Atterbeary) Adopted60
Third Reading Passed (95-27)60
Senate4/5/20183/31/2018Returned Passed62

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 5, 2018 11:07 A.M.