SB1041

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Physical and Digital Infrastructure in the Public Schools - Assessment

Sponsored by:

Senator Rosapepe

Status:

In the House - Favorable Report by Ways and Means


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/17/20162/17/2016First Reading Senate Rules
2/18/20162/19/2016Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/20162/19/2016Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
4/6/20164/6/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/6/20163/31/2016Favorable with Amendments {324533/1 Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed with Amendments60
4/7/20164/1/2016Third Reading Passed (44-0)61
House4/7/20164/1/2016First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations64
4/9/20164/9/2016Rereferred to Ways and Means
Hearing 4/11 at 9:00 a.m.
4/11/20164/11/2016Favorable Report by Ways and Means

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:11 P.M.